RI S0611 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Commissioner Of The Department Of Business Banking Regulation To Conduct A Study And Make Recommendations On The Legislation Necessary To Implement Crowdfunding In The State Of Rhode Island

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Commissioner Of The Department Of Business Banking Regulation To Conduct A Study And Make Recommendations On The Legislation Necessary To Implement Crowdfunding In The State Of Rhode Island

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-14 - Senate - Study implementing crowdfunding approval of amendment lc 002009/2 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/14/2015)
2015-04-07SenateCommittee recommends passage
2015-04-03SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2015)
2015-03-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback