RI S0606 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 20 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Classifies all vehicles used by the department of corrections in the performance official duties as authorized emergency vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions And General Code Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2019-06-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2019)
2019-06-18HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-05HouseReferred to House Corporations
2019-06-04SenateSenate read and passed
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019)
2019-05-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-23SenateScheduled for consideration (05/28/2019)
2019-04-30SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2019)
2019-03-14SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback