RI S0584 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Percentage of Income Home Energy Affordability Program, an income-sensitive tiered subsidy program to ensure that home energy utility costs are affordable for eligible low-income households.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Percentage Of Income Home Energy Affordability Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021)
2021-03-11SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback