RI S0584 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island State Auditor General To Conduct Or Oversee A Study Or Audit On The Privatization Of Rhode Island's Medicaid Programs
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island State Auditor General To Conduct Or Oversee A Study Or Audit On The Privatization Of Rhode Island's Medicaid Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2019) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0584.pdf |