RI S0555 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Commercial Law - General Regulatory Provisions - Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals (would Require The Electronic Submission Of Required Reports Under This Chapter To The Attorney General.)
Title
An Act Relating To Commercial Law - General Regulatory Provisions - Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals (would Require The Electronic Submission Of Required Reports Under This Chapter To The Attorney General.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2013) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |