RI S0549 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation: would increase the exemption for Warwick residents on owner occupied real property from ten thousand dollars ($10,000) to twelve thousand dollars ($12,000
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-28 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-22 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-22 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-22 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-05 | Referred to House Municipal Government | |
2011-03-31 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-03-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0549.pdf |