RI S0548 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Trespass And Vandalism (would Amend And Expand The Penalties For Creating Graffiti And Otherwise Defacing Certain Property.)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses -- Trespass And Vandalism (would Amend And Expand The Penalties For Creating Graffiti And Otherwise Defacing Certain Property.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013) |
2013-06-13 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2013) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2013) |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Recommended for Immediate Consideration |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2013) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2013) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Committee heard |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2013) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |