RI S0546 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the statute governing prescriptions of controlled substances by making reference to regulations issued by the department of health.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act -- Electronic Prescription Of Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Uniform controlled substances electronic prescription approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Uniform controlled substances electronic prescription approval of amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |