RI S0541 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the number of advisory council members from twenty-seven (27) to fifteen (15) and eliminates the duty of the advisory council to advise the administrator of the veterans' home.
Title
Rhode Island Veterans' Home - Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Advisory council in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed as amended |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2017) |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |