RI S0538 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $5,000,000 To Eleanor Slater Hospital, Zambarano Unit (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $5,000,000 To Eleanor Slater Hospital, Zambarano Unit For The Purpose Of Re-building A Fire Station On Wallum Lake.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $5,000,000 To Eleanor Slater Hospital, Zambarano Unit (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $5,000,000 To Eleanor Slater Hospital, Zambarano Unit For The Purpose Of Re-building A Fire Station On Wallum Lake.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2023) |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |