RI S0532 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-18 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-18 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - State Building Code: would provide that the issuance of a physical alteration permit shall be required for the issuance of a building permit, however the lack of a physical alteration permit shall not delay an examination by a building official
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - State Building Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2011-05-17 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-31 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0532.pdf |