RI S0530 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Proclaiming March 9, 2017, To Be "world Kidney Day" In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
Senate Resolution Proclaiming March 9, 2017, To Be "world Kidney Day" In The State Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/09/2017) |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0530.pdf |