RI S0527 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Meeting postponed (06/24/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Meeting postponed (06/24/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits new high-heat waste processing facilities.
Title
Relating To Health And Safety- High-heat Waste Facility Act Of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-03-14 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/15/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0527.pdf |