RI S0517 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes litigation loan agreements subject to state usury statutes.
Title
Litigation Lending Agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Senate voted to recommit to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate held on desk |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/04/2017) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/09/2017) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0517.pdf |