RI S0484 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for medical assistance health care for expectant mothers and would establish medical assistance coverage and reimbursement rates for perinatal doula services. Effective 7/1/22.
Title
Medical Assistance -- Perinatal Doula Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-24 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-20 | House | Committee transferred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |