RI S0465 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes private savings (ABLE) account for qualifying disabled persons wherein monies grow tax free and used for qualifying expenses per Section 529A of Internal Revenue Service Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office Of Health And Human Services--able Accounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-24 - House of Representatives - Passage in concurrence (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-09SenateSigned by Governor
2015-07-07SenateTransmitted to Governor
2015-06-24HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2015-06-24HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/24/2015)
2015-06-24HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2015-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration (06/24/2015)
2015-06-17HouseReferred to House Finance
2015-06-16SenateSenate passed Sub A
2015-06-10SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/16/2015)
2015-06-09SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-06-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/09/2015)
2015-03-26SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-03-24SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2015)
2015-02-26SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback