RI S0462 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-19 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-19 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Ri Health Care Reform Act Of 2004: would allow health plans to implement a tiered provider network where providers will be classified into tiers based on their rates of favorable patient outcomes and without regard to the practice groups or facilities with which the provider is affiliated
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government -- Ri Health Care Reform Act Of 2004
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2011-05-18 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-23 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0462.pdf |