RI S0451 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires state/city/town to install solar panels supplying at least 50% of the electrical needs within five (5) years of the completion date for any new public buildings, including schools, prior to the issuance of a construction permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Building Code

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-05SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019)
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback