RI S0413 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
College security may detain criminal offenders.
Title
Arrest
Sponsors
Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0413.pdf |