RI S0397 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the criminal and civil protections to lawful users of medical marijuana. This act also provides for civil damages to be imposed upon violators of these protections.
Title
The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0397.pdf |