RI S0389 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions - Real Estate Appraiser Certification Act (would Limit The Ability Of The Dbr To Investigate Complaints Made On Appraisals That Fall Outside (more Than 5 Years Old) The Record Retention Requirements Of The Uspap (uniform Standards Of Professional Appraisal Practice).)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions - Real Estate Appraiser Certification Act (would Limit The Ability Of The Dbr To Investigate Complaints Made On Appraisals That Fall Outside (more Than 5 Years Old) The Record Retention Requirements Of The Uspap (uniform Standards Of Professional Appraisal Practice).)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2013) |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Commerce |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0389.pdf |