RI S0356 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires elementary/secondary schools to have at least 1 school employee trained to administer/assist with the self-administering of seizure rescue medication prescribed to treat seizure disorder systems and the use of prescribed electrical stimulation.
Title
Seizure Safe Schools Act
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2021) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0356.pdf |