RI S0349 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes on breeders requirements already in place on other pet custodial agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-19 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Animal care (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2017-10-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2017-09-15HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-06-30HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
2017-06-29HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2017-06-29HouseScheduled for consideration (06/29/2017)
2017-06-22HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2017-06-21SenateSenate read and passed
2017-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2017)
2017-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage
2017-06-09SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2017)
2017-02-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2017)
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback