RI S0331 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-28 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-28 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes HHS to apply for waivers to assure for housing, healthcare, and mental and behavioral health care services for the homeless.
Title
Relating To Human Services
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/27/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |