RI S0322 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation - Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes (would Prevent A Municipality From Taxing A New Single-family Dwelling Unit/residential Condominium Unit At Its Full And Fair Cash Value For As Long As Said New Dwelling Or Condominium Unit Is Not Occupied, Has Never Been Occupied, And Is For Sale)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation - Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes (would Prevent A Municipality From Taxing A New Single-family Dwelling Unit/residential Condominium Unit At Its Full And Fair Cash Value For As Long As Said New Dwelling Or Condominium Unit Is Not Occupied, Has Never Been Occupied, And Is For Sale)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-20 | House | Senate held on desk |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2013) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2013) |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Substitute A |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2013) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2013) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |