RI S0313 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation real property acquired or leased by a railroad entity used in the boarding or disembarking of railroad passengers or supporting passenger railroad operations and services.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |