RI S0309 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a person convicted of unnecessary cruelty to animals from owning or exercising control of an animal for life and be subject to fine of $1000 for each violation of this act.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] |
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0309.pdf |