RI S0305 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all school districts to designate an athletic trainer to be available for high school athletic practices and games.
Title
School And Youth Programs Concussion Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0305.pdf |