RI S0288 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Law - Parole Board (would Require Parole Board Members Be Appointed With The Advice And Consent Of The Senate And Serve No More Than 3 Terms.)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Law - Parole Board (would Require Parole Board Members Be Appointed With The Advice And Consent Of The Senate And Serve No More Than 3 Terms.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/06/2013) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2013) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |