RI S0275 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires infants and toddlers under two (2) years of age or weighing less than thirty pounds (30 lbs.) be retrained in rear-facing car seats.
Title
Child Restraint Systems
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Child restraint systems (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Child restraint systems (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-06-01 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |