RI S0270 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that legally appointed guardians, whether temporary or permanent, file for their ward, a durable power of attorney for health care and/or a living will within thirty (30) days of appointment and to adhere to the expressed wishes of their ward.
Title
Limited Guardianship And Guardianship Of Adults
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0270.pdf |