RI S0268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits retail sales establishments from providing plastic checkout bags and all retail establishments from providing expanded polystyrene disposable food containers and would be enforced by municipal designees, with an opt out provision.
Title
Plastic Waste Reduction Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0268.pdf |