RI S0265 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restores provisions of chapter 16.2 of title 23 as well as all of chapter 16.3 of title 23, which were repealed or deleted in the 2015 Budget Act, relating to definitions, licensing, and the operation of medical laboratories.
Title
Laboratories
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0265.pdf |