RI S0263 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a cause of action against encroacher of open space land or conservation easements.
Title
Trespass And Actions For Possession
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0263.pdf |