RI S0247 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Raw Milk Regulations (creates A 9 Member Commission To Be Known As The "commission To Study Raw Milk Regulations" And Whose Purpose Would Be To Review All Raw Milk Regulations And Make Recommendations And Who Would Report Back By January 2, 2018, And Expire On March 2, 2018.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Raw Milk Regulations (creates A 9 Member Commission To Be Known As The "commission To Study Raw Milk Regulations" And Whose Purpose Would Be To Review All Raw Milk Regulations And Make Recommendations And Who Would Report Back By January 2, 2018, And Expire On March 2, 2018.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30SenateSenate passed Sub A
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
2017-06-28SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2017)
2017-04-05SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017)
2017-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback