RI S0244 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any public utility or its contractor to reimburse an excavator for lost time expense incurred, including manpower and equipment from the utility's incorrect marking of underground utilities.
Title
Excavation Near Underground Utility Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0244.pdf |