RI S0241 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds military status discrimination as an unlawful housing practice protecting veterans who have an honorable or administrative discharge or a member of the Armed Forces of the United States and the Rhode Island National Guard.
Title
The Rhode Island Fair Housing Practices Act
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2015) |
2015-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2015) |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/17/2015) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |