RI S0239 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study The Quality Of Life And Create Positive Outcomes For Individuals With Autism In The State Of Rhode Island (would Create A 23 Member Special Joint Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study To Improve The Quality Of Life And Create Positive Outcomes For Individuals With Autism Spectrum Disorders)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study The Quality Of Life And Create Positive Outcomes For Individuals With Autism In The State Of Rhode Island (would Create A 23 Member Special Joint Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study To Improve The Quality Of Life And Create Positive Outcomes For Individuals With Autism Spectrum Disorders)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-24SenateSigned by Governor
2013-06-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2013-06-18HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2013-06-12HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/18/2013)
2013-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2013-06-07HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2013)
2013-05-23HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2013-05-22SenateSenate passed Sub A
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/22/2013)
2013-05-15SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2013-05-10SenateScheduled for consideration (05/15/2013)
2013-03-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2013-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2013)
2013-02-06SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback