RI S0233 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the capital gains tax rates and holding period from 5 years to 1 year. Imposes a non-owner occupied tax on homes assessed at more than $1,000,000.
Title
Personal Income Tax -- Capital Gains
Sponsors
Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0233.pdf |