RI S0226 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the percentage of state beach fees payable to the city or town where the facility is located from sixteen percent (16%) to twenty percent (20%).
Title
Department Of Environmental Management - User Fees
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Mark Gee [R] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0226.pdf |