RI S0218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits PFAS, a class of fluorinated organic chemicals, from being used in food packaging.
Title
Pfas In Food Packaging
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2019) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/11/2019) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0218.pdf |