RI S0200 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-30 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires sealers of weights and measures appointed by the cities or towns to receive the same fees as charged by state sealers who perform the same inspecting/testing services.
Title
Produce Scales In Markets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/29/2015) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/16/2015) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2015) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |