RI S0198 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Requires a condominium association to provide a unit owner, whose unit has sustained insurance covered damages, with a written copy of the insurance company's damage appraisal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominium Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Condominium insurance approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSigned by Governor
2017-06-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-27HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2017-06-24HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
2017-06-06HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
2017-06-02HouseScheduled for consideration (06/06/2017)
2017-05-03HouseReferred to House Corporations
2017-05-02SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/02/2017)
2017-04-25SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-04-21SenateScheduled for consideration (04/25/2017)
2017-03-09SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017)
2017-02-02SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback