RI S0186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Taxation-levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes-central Falls (would Authorize The City Council Of The City Of Central Falls To Increase The Amount Of Time For Tax Exemptions For Certain Improvements To Qualifying Real And Personal Property From 5 Years To 10 Years.)
Title
An Act Relating To Taxation-levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes-central Falls (would Authorize The City Council Of The City Of Central Falls To Increase The Amount Of Time For Tax Exemptions For Certain Improvements To Qualifying Real And Personal Property From 5 Years To 10 Years.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-13 | House | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2013) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2013) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2013) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2013) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |