RI S0132 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the time convicted murderers must serve of their sentences before they are eligible for parole.
Title
Correctional Institutions
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2015-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-05-11 | House | Meeting postponed (05/12/2015) |
2015-05-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/28/2015) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2015) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2015) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |