RI S0124 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the sales tax on pet care services.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0124.pdf |