RI S0108 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the climate change coordinating council to study a carbon pricing program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resilient Rhode Island Act Of 2014 - Climate Change Coordinating Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Climate change coordinating coun approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-19SenateSigned by Governor
2017-07-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-28HouseHouse passed as amended in concurrence
2017-06-28HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017)
2017-06-27HouseCommittee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
2017-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
2017-05-05HouseReferred to House Environment and Natural Resources
2017-05-04SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/04/2017)
2017-04-26SenateCommittee recommends passage
2017-04-21SenateScheduled for consideration (04/26/2017)
2017-03-01SenateCommittee heard
2017-02-24SenateScheduled for hearing (03/01/2017)
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback