RI S0106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of education to consider incorporating media literacy education in the basic education program.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2017) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2017) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |