RI S0103 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (general Assembly) (would Have Electors Vote On A Rhode Island Constitutional Amendment Requiring All Senators, Representatives And General Office Holders To Pay Twenty Percent (20%) Of Their Health Insurance Premiums.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (general Assembly) (would Have Electors Vote On A Rhode Island Constitutional Amendment Requiring All Senators, Representatives And General Office Holders To Pay Twenty Percent (20%) Of Their Health Insurance Premiums.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0103.pdf |