RI S0095 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
The office of regulatory reform shall consult with various state agencies and plant-based representatives to facilitate economic growth.
Title
Rhode Island Regulatory Reform Act
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |